Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.70.130.162

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.70.130.162
Case Number: 1:2013cv00644
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/2/2013. (mehcd)
July 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/22/13. (jjhsl, )
April 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reassignment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 04/01/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.70.130.162
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.70.130.162
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]