Cantrell v. Gdowski et al

Defendant: Adams 12 Five Star Schools, Shelley Becker, Kristy Riccio and Chris Gdowski
Plaintiff: Tracey Cantrell
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00679
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint [#12-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/27/13.(mnfsl, )
May 16, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Defendants Motion to Stay Pending Immunity Determinations. The case is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion for Summary Judgment 27 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for May 27, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference will be reset, if needed, after resolution of the Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/16/2014.(evana, )
March 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cantrell v. Gdowski et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams 12 Five Star Schools
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Becker
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Riccio
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gdowski
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Cantrell
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]