Purzel Video GmbH, Inc. v. Does 1-200

Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-200
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00683
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/16/13.(jjhsl, )
April 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Renew its Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/30/2013. (mehcd)
July 31, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/31/2013. (mehcd)
August 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Doe No. 22 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and Doe No. 53 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
August 30, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Doe Nos. 15 and 43 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2013. (trlee, )
October 11, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Clifford Felder is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/11/13. (jjhsl, )
November 6, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 50 the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed by Purzel Video GmbH, Inc., is APPROVED. Defendant Nicholas Rich is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees, costs, and expenses, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/6/2013. (ervsl, )
November 12, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Purzel Video GmbH, Inc. v. Does 1-200
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-200
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]