ILS, Inc v. WMM, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ILS Inc
Defendant: Dataman Group, Inc., J-Mail, Inc., Jayson Kline and WMM, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00684
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 18:1030g Fraud & Related Matters in Connection w/ Computers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 5/29/2013 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/18/13. (cbssec)
July 9, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/9/13. (msksec, )
August 16, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Claims as to Defendant Dataman, Inc. Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Dataman, Inc. (# 35 ) is GRANTED and any and all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Dataman, Inc. are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own attorney fees and costs. All future captions shall so reflect. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/2013.(klyon, )
September 6, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint ESI Protocol. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 09/06/2013. (cbslc1)
February 13, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Claims. 48 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice is GRANTED. Claims against Defendants J-Mail, Inc. and Jayson Kline are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own attorney fees and costs. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/13/2014.(klyon, )
September 4, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WMM's Motion for Summary Judgment 50 is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as WMM is entitled to summary judgment on ILS' claims of violation of the CCPA, c ivil theft, civil conspiracy, and tortious interference with contract, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as ILS' misappropriation of trade secrets claim will proceed to trial. The parties shall promptly begin preparation of a Proposed Pretrial Order in conformance with the Trial Preparation Order (#32) and shall jointly contact chambers immediately to schedule a Pretrial Conference. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/3/14.(msksec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ILS, Inc v. WMM, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILS Inc
Represented By: Rory Lane Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dataman Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-Mail, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lin Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Kline
Represented By: Nancy Lin Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMM, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]