Elf-Man, LLC v. Does 1-4

Defendant: John Does 1-4
Plaintiff: Elf-Man, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00686
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 5/2/2013, denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule26(f) Conference. FTR: C. Pearson - Courtroom A-501. (mehcd) Modified on 5/2/2013 to correct text (mehcd).
August 19, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot the following motions: 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File and Serve First Amended Complaint Naming Doe Number 1, and 19 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File and Serve First Amended Complaint Naming Doe Number 1. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2013. (mehcd)
October 29, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint in Order to Identify Defendant John Doe 3 by Name 43 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant William Hall 41 , which relies on the content and service of the First Amended Complaint, is denied without prejudice as moot by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/13.(jjhsl, )
October 30, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint and Case Caption by Interlineation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Corrected Second Amended Complaint located at docket [47-1]. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and all applicable rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/30/2013. (mehcd)
February 7, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2014 is vacated. Dismissal papers due by 2/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/7/2014. (mehcd)
February 20, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Elf-Man, LLC and Joseph Tincknells Stipulated Motion To Dismiss Defendant Tincknell With Prejudice Pursuant To Fed. R.Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (A)(ii). Party Joseph Tincknell is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/20/2014.(evana, )
April 8, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 64 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Defendant William Hall, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/8/2014. (cpear)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elf-Man, LLC v. Does 1-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elf-Man, LLC
Represented By: David John Stephenson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]