Brooks v. Safeguard Properties, LLC

Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Laura Brooks
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00691
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Park
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion to Stay by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/23/13. The parties are directed to file status reports every 30 days. (dkals, )
October 11, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice, this matter is dismissed without prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/11/2013. (eseam)
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/3/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks v. Safeguard Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Brooks
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]