Henson et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al

Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc. ("TEMA"), Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Incorporated (TMS) and Toyota Motor Corporation (TMC)
Plaintiff: Annette Henson and Randall Suba
Case Number: 1:2013cv00694
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 18, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/18/2013. (rpmcd)
June 24, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference for 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/24/2013. (rpmcd)
August 16, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 39 and 43 : Plaintiff Annette Hensons claims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/16/2013. (rpmcd)
August 19, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Michael S. Burg, Reeves D. Whalen, Seth Alan Katz and Holly Baer Kammerer have no further responsibility as counsel for the plaintiff in this action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Randall Suba shall have 30 days, to and including September 18, 2013, within which to obtain new counsel or indicate his readiness to proceed to represent himself without counsel, failing in which this civil action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2013. (ervsl, )
December 16, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to prosecute, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/16/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc. ("TEMA")
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: John R. Trigg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: John R. Trigg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Incorporated (TMS)
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: John R. Trigg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation (TMC)
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: John R. Trigg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Henson
Represented By: Richard C. Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Suba
Represented By: Richard C. Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]