Sansing et al v. Patterson et al

Defendant: City of Cherry Hills Village and John Patterson
Plaintiff: Michelle Edwardson, Suzanne Rogers and Jody Sansing
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00696
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 42 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The parties have informed the Court that a settlement has been reached as to all claims. The evidentiary hearing set for 12/13/2013 is vacated. Dismissal papers due by 12/31/2013. 22 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/12/2013. (mehcd)
December 13, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims, the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Michelle Edwardson and Suzanne Rogers against Defendant John Patterson shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/13/2013. (eseam)
December 16, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER dismissing with prejudice the claims of Plaintiffs Michelle Edwardson and Suzanne Rogers against Defendant City of Cherry Hills Village by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/16/13. (dkals, )
January 10, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the 49 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims, the claims asserted by Plaintiff Jody Sansing against Defendant John Patterson shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/10/2014. (eseam)
January 15, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the 53 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims, the claims asserted by Plaintiff Jody Sansing against Defendant City of Cherry Hills Village shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/15/2014. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sansing et al v. Patterson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cherry Hills Village
Represented By: Sophia Hua Tsai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patterson
Represented By: Sophia Hua Tsai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Edwardson
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Represented By: John R. Holland
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Rogers
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Represented By: John R. Holland
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Sansing
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Represented By: John R. Holland
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]