Wilson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Sherri L. Wilson
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 1:2013cv00699
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/15/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/14/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/29/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/6/13. (mnfsl, )
December 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming ALJ's Decision Denying Social Security Benefits by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/9/13. (dkals, )
March 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/25/13. (sgrim)
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/25/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Wilson
Represented By: Brett Michael Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.