McDonald et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation, a Japanese Corporation et al

Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation
Plaintiff: Leslie (I) McDonald and Leslie McDonald
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00704
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 18 Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Protective Order. The Motion is DENIED and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED. The parties are granted leave to submit a motion for protective order and revised form of protective order consistent with the comments contained here. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/03/13. (alvsl)
July 9, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/9/13. (sgrim)
March 6, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/20/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/6/2014.(klyon, )
June 4, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay case, that this case is stayed until September 1, 2014. On such date, the parties will file a status report with the Court. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/4/2014.(trlee, )
August 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending stay of case until 10/15/2014, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2014. (trlee, )
April 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/16/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDonald et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation, a Japanese Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie (I) McDonald
Represented By: Richard Joshua Hood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie McDonald
Represented By: Richard Joshua Hood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]