Hodge v. Miller et al

Respondent: Attorney General State of Colorado and Michael Miller
Petitioner: Blanch C. Hodge, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00706
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case will be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/10/13. (nmmsl, )
July 10, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/13, For State Court Record. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of this order to the following: (1) Clerk of the Court, El Paso County District Court, P.O. Box 2980, Colorado Springs, Colorado 80901-2980; and (2) Court Services Manager, State Court Administrators Office, 1300 Broadway, Denver, Colorado 80203. (nmmsl, )
July 17, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER to Dismiss in Part and for Answer re: 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Blanch C. Hodge, Jr. For the reasons discussed above, it is ORDERED that claim one of the § 2254 Application is DISMISSED as barred by the one-y ear limitation period in 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d). It is FURTHER ORDERED that claim three of the § 2254 Application is DISMISSED because it fails to present a federal issue cognizable on federal habeas review. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days, Respondent(s) shall file an Answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of exhausted claim two of the Application. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the filing of the answer Applicant may file a reply, if he desires. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/17/13. (alvsl)
January 24, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER that the pro se Application for a Writ of Habeas CorpusPursuant to 28.S.C. § 2254 1 , filed by Applicant Blanch Hodge, Jr., on March 18,2013, is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/24/2014. (trlee, ) Modified on 1/24/2014 to correct a typo (trlee, ).
January 27, 2014 44 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Attorney General State of Colorado, Michael Miller against Blanch C. Hodge, Jr., by Clerk on 1/27/2014. (trlee, )
March 20, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/20/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hodge v. Miller et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Colorado
Represented By: Matthew S. Holman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Miller
Represented By: Matthew S. Holman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blanch C. Hodge, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]