Schuster v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Tiffany Schuster
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00718
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Montezuma
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/25/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/26/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/10/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/19/13. (mnfsl, )
February 28, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Administrative Law Judge's Decision and Remanding Case to the Commissioner for re-hearing, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/28/2014. (evana, )
March 3, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is VACATED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for rehearing, by Deputy Clerk on 3/3/2014. (wjmcd, )
March 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/25/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schuster v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Schuster
Represented By: Gail C. Harriss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]