Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.74.205

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.74.205
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00740
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/2/2013. (mehcd)
December 18, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Hegartys Recommendation ECF No. 25 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. Accordingly, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Malibu Medias Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment Against Defendant Kasra Keighobady ECF No. 23 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/2013.(ervsl, )
March 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.74.205
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.74.205
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]