Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.237.107.180

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.237.107.180
Case Number: 1:2013cv00742
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/1/2013. (mehcd)
April 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying with prejudice 13 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/26/13.(jjhsl, )
May 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Quash by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/07/13.(jjhsl, )
July 31, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Courtney Coe is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and this case is terminated by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/13/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.237.107.180
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.237.107.180
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]