Ferrugia v. City of Steamboat Springs, et al

Defendant: Richard Brown, City of Steamboat Springs, Geis, Evan Driscole and Ross Blank
Plaintiff: John Ferrugia
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00747
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/13/13. (sgrim)
August 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's "Second Amended Complaint" 22 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff may refile the Second Amended Complaint if his motion to amend 21 is granted by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/09/13.(jjhsl, )
August 15, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/15/13.(jjhsl, )
February 24, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Late Expert Witness Disclosure by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/24/14.(jhawk, )
March 11, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER STRIKING 49 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/11/2014.(evana, )
March 20, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Plaintiffs Motion for Court Ordered Alternate Dispute Resolution. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Tafoyas chambers not later than April 3, 2014 in order to schedule a settlement conference, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/20/2014.(evana, )
March 21, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 4/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/21/2014. (evana, )
April 9, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/9/14. (sgrim)
May 29, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Defendants' Motion to Designate Rebuttal Non-Retained Expert Disclosures Out of Time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/29/14.(sgrim)
September 16, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants motion for partial summary judgment ECF No. 48 and Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment ECF No. 56 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: Summary Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants with r espect to Plaintiffs false arrest claim and the municipal liability claim as it relates to the false arrest claim. The motions are DENIED in all other respects. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a 5-day jury trial is set for Monday, April 20, 2015 at 8:3 0 a.m. A final trial preparation conference is set for Tuesday, April 7, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are reminded to review and comply with all directives set forth in my Practice Standards with respect to trial preparation, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/16/2014.(evana, )
March 29, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/29/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ferrugia v. City of Steamboat Springs, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Steamboat Springs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geis
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Driscole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Blank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ferrugia
Represented By: Grant Patrick Bursek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]