Grady v. Brodersen

Plaintiff: James S. Grady
Defendant: Evan Brodersen
Case Number: 1:2013cv00752
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/28/2015. (athom, )
April 29, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 109 Motion to Strike Defendant's Untimely Motion in Limine is granted, but only insofar as it is consistent with the forgoing findings and conclusions and the following orders: that under D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) & (d) a nd REB Civ. Practice Standard IV.E.2., Defendant Evan Brodersen's Motion in Limine [# 90 ] is denied; and that the Amended Minute Order [# 108 ] entered 4/28/2015, requiring the plaintiff to respond to certain portions of the motion in limine, is withdrawn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/29/2015.(alowe)
April 30, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Juror Questionnaire) (alowe)
April 30, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 112 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with prejudice is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/2015. (alowe)
February 10, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 33 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdictionand Improper Venue [# 17 ] filed May 6, 2013, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/10/2014.(klyon, )
February 20, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 12/19/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set 1/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/20/14. (rebsec,)
September 11, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Transfer Case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/2014.(alowe)
September 15, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 48 MOTION to Compel Production of Computers: IT IS ORDERED that defense counsel shall attend the hearing on 9/16/2014, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, as previously ordered. Failure to attend may constitute a contempt of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/15/2014. (alowe )
September 16, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/16/14 re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Extension 48 . The Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (bsimm, )
March 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 5/29/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/29/13. (bnbcd, )
March 23, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Sanctions. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/23/15. (nywlc1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Brodersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Grady
Represented By: Andrew John Contiguglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Brodersen
Represented By: Robert Werner Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.