Gmerek v. Peer Assistance Services, Inc.

Defendant: Peer Assistance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beverly C. Gmerek
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00753
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/30/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/1/13. (bnbcd, )
October 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/13. (bnbcd, )
November 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/13: Dismissal Papers are due by 12/2/2013. (dkals, )
December 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 27 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/2/2013. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gmerek v. Peer Assistance Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peer Assistance Services, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Keen
Represented By: Emma Jane Skivington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly C. Gmerek
Represented By: Temitayo O. Okunade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]