Donaldson v. Daniels

Defendant: C. Daniels
Plaintiff: Daquan Lamel Donaldson
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00757
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/20/2013. (skl)
May 29, 2013 15 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as unnecessary 14 Motion for Order to Proceed without paying filing fee, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/29/13.(nmmsl, )
June 20, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the Complaint and action are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1) as legally frivolous. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/20/2013. (ervsl, )
March 28, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/28/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Donaldson v. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daquan Lamel Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]