Leonard v. American National Property and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Kathy Leonard
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00758
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Remand, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/22/2013.(rpmcd )
October 3, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 15 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/3/2013. (rpmcd)
January 29, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/29/2014. (rpmcd )
March 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/15/2013 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/25/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Leonard
Represented By: Kirk Randall McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: David Paul Ganderton
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.