Beinfield v. Standard Insurance Company

Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lynn A Beinfield
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00759
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 17 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/16/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 6/2/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/17/13. (rebsec, )
May 21, 2013 24 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. The written Protective Order (22-1) is approved as amended in paragraphs 11, 11 a., and 13 (e) and made an Order of Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/2013.(mjwcd)
May 21, 2013 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/2013. (mjwcd)
January 13, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice [#30] filed January 9, 2014, is APPROVED. Ordered that the Trial Preparation Conference set May 16, 2014, is VACATED. Ordered that the jury trial set to commence June 2, 2014, is VACATED. Ordered that any pending motion is DENIED as moot. Ordered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/13/14. (jjhsl, )
March 27, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/27/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beinfield v. Standard Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy Anne Carpenter
Represented By: Joseph T. VanLandingham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn A Beinfield
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]