Priest v. Tobin et al

Plaintiff: James C. Priest, III
Defendant: T. Tobin and Brian Husum
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00779
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/28/13. (sgrim)
January 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Recommendation on defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Docket No. 22 is ACCEPTED. It is further Docket No. 14 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and shall be closed in its entirety. It is further ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/9/2014.(ervsl, )
January 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, re: 29 Order. By Clerk on 1/14/14. (mnfsl, )
March 28, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/28/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Priest v. Tobin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Priest, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Tobin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Husum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]