Norstar Residential, LLLP et al v. First Mercury Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kelly Begg, Norstar, Inc, Norstar Residential, LLLP, Wildhorse Ridge, LLLP and Concert American Homes, Inc.
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00785
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 6/11/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/26/13. (bnbcd, )
October 21, 2013 41 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2013. 35 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Complaint and Jury Demand is DENIED. 32 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Complaint and Jury Demand is DENIED. 22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Written Discovery Request is DENIED. 19 Motion for Order to Compel and 28 Defendant's Motion to Compel Subpoenaed Documents is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, written order to issue. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
October 21, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash 22 is DENIED; The Motion to Stay 32 is DENIED; The Motion to Strike 35 is DENIED; Motion to Compel 19 and the Motion to Compel: Subpoenas 28 are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/21/13. (bnbcd, )
October 23, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER denying 19 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/13.(bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Norstar Residential, LLLP et al v. First Mercury Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Begg
Represented By: Allan Robert Mena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norstar, Inc
Represented By: Allan Robert Mena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norstar Residential, LLLP
Represented By: Allan Robert Mena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildhorse Ridge, LLLP
Represented By: Allan Robert Mena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concert American Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Allan Robert Mena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: James K. Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]