Blackwell et al v. Dillon Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Scott Warehime, Lynn Sutton-Case, William Rosenau, David Blackwell, Glen Case, Jr. and Ken Moore
Defendant: Dillion Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00792
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0216 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Adjourn theScheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 10/8/2013 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order no later than 10/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/16/2013.(klyon, )
October 11, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/11/13. (msksec, )
November 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion for Modification to theScheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/15/2013.(klyon, )
February 24, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Settlement. The Unopposed Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement [# 37 ] is granted. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/2014.(klyon, )
February 24, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 32 Amended Motion for Modification to the Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/2014.(klyon, )
April 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell et al v. Dillon Companies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Warehime
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Sutton-Case
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rosenau
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Blackwell
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Case, Jr.
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Moore
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillion Companies, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]