Morgan v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn C. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Morgan
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00795
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVERSING DISABILITY DECISION AND DIRECTING AWARD OF BENEFITS. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/18/2014. (alowe)
September 19, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Sandra J. Morgan against Carolyn C. Colvin re: 15 Order Reversing Disability Decision and Directing Award of Benefits. By Clerk on 9/19/2014. (alowe)
October 9, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 59(e). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/9/2014.(alowe)
October 9, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 18 Order on Unopposed Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 59(e). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/9/2014. (alowe)
June 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/15/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 9/12/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/26/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/20/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morgan v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn C. Colvin
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Morgan
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]