Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Young et al

Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Sentry Construction, Inc., Michael D Young and DBCAJT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00800
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 1, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/21/2013. (rpmcd )
July 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Set Aside Entries of Default re 11 and 15 : the Clerk Entries of Defaults on defendants Michael D. Young and Sentry Construction, Inc. are vacated and Answer and Counterclaims, filed June 21, 2013 16 , is timely filed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/1/2013.(rpmcd)
December 3, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their respective costs and attorney fees, re 16 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/3/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Young et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendelyn K. Walberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Construction, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBCAJT, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]