Ingila v. Dish Network Corporation

Plaintiff: Fifi Meno Ingila
Defendant: Dish Network Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00809
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 12 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate June 26, 2013 Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 6/26/2013 10:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. The Second Amended Complaint 11 is made the operative pleading, defendant's name changed accordingly. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/13/2013.(mjwcd)
August 20, 2013 21 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/20/13. (msksec, )
September 3, 2013 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective Order (24-1) is approved as amended in paragraph 9 and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/3/2013.(mjwcd)
September 3, 2013 27 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/3/2013. (mjwcd)
October 29, 2013 33 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw. Joseph P. Stengel Jr., John Case, and Kari Jones shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff Fifi Meno Ingila. plaintiff Fifi Meno Ingila shall either retain newcounsel forthwith or be prepa red to proceed without counsel on all future matters, including hearings, depositions, motions, and trial. The Clerk isdirected to mail plaintiff Fifi Meno Ingila a copy of the 19 Scheduling Order at her last known address. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/29/2013.(klyon, )
December 5, 2013 36 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/13.(mnfsl, )
January 21, 2014 43 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Witness Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/14/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/21/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 49 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to June 20, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/2014.(klyon, )
April 11, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Re: Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2014.(emill)
April 10, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2013. (mjwcd)
May 9, 2013 9 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate May 28, 2013 Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 5/28/2013 is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. The parties' Proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 6/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/9/2013.(mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ingila v. Dish Network Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifi Meno Ingila
Represented By: Joseph P. Stengel, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]