Peaker v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Wesley Peaker
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00849
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a four-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 16, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 19, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/15/2013. (rbjsec. )
July 7, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/7/2014. (trlee, )
April 3, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/03/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Peaker v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Peaker
Represented By: Thomas Dean Neville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]