Sedivy-Brown v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tonya Sedivy-Brown
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00851
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/25/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/13. (rebcd)
October 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [# 21 ] is APPROVED. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for4/25/2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 5/12/2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/15/2013. (klyon, )
April 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/4/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sedivy-Brown v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Lyndsay K. Arundel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Sedivy-Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]