Finney v. Lockheed Martin Corporation

Plaintiff: Richard Finney
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00869
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/26/13. (msksec, )
October 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/2/13. (bnbcd, )
January 22, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines for Expert Witness Disclosure. The parties shall designate all expertsand provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 1/25/2014, and the parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 3/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/22/2014. (klyon, )
April 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 6/13/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Finney
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]