Solis v. Integrity Solution Services, Inc.

Defendant: Integrity Solution Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tina Solis
Case Number: 1:2013cv00870
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Correct the Nameof the Defendant and the Case Caption. ORDER that the name of the Defendant in this case is changed to Integrity Solution Services, Inc., a Missouri corporation, f/k/a Pinnacle Financial Group, Incorporated, a Minnesotacorporation, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/13/2013.(ervsl, )
June 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/25/13. (sgrim)
March 24, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/24/2014. The court Grants 40 Motion to File First Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. The Court Grants in Part and Denies in Part [43 ] Motion for Protective Order. Discovery due by 5/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. FTR: KMT Courtroom C-201. (lgale)
July 18, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Erica Solis against Integrity Solution Services, Inc. re: 58 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, on 7/18/2014. (trlee, )
April 15, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/15/2013. (kmtcd)
September 9, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot the 62 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 70 Motion for Judgment, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/9/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Integrity Solution Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Solution Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Solis
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]