Cortez v. Flores et al

Plaintiff: Ivan Cortez
Defendant: Christopher Flores, Katherine Laconte, Jonathan McCluskey and Thomas Decesaro
Case Number: 1:2013cv00880
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant, Katherine LaConte, Only. The Stipulated Motion For Partial Dismissal [# 15 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Katherine Laconte, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay i ts own attorney fees and costs. Plaintiff's unlawful seizure claim, except the claim that defendants, Flores, Decesaro and/or McCluskey, used excessive force during the seizure of plaintiff, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, Katherine Laconte, is DROPPED as a named party to thisaction, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/2013.(klyon, )
October 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Joint Combined Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Defendants shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 11/8/2013. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2013 at 10:00 a.m. is CONVERTED to a Status Conference. At the Status Conference, the Scheduling Conference shall be reset to a later date, if necessary. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/10/2013.(klyon, )
November 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendants [# 24 ] is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to paytheir own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/7/2013. (klyon, )
April 5, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/17/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Flores et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Cortez
Represented By: Matthew Scott Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Flores
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Laconte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan McCluskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Decesaro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]