Rantz v. Hartley et al

Petitioner: Geoffrey Del Rantz
Respondent: Steve Hartley and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00883
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denied without prejudice 10 Request for the Court to Change the Petitioner/Applicant's Filed Habeas Corpus Petition to "Next Friend" Status, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/05/2013.(skl)
July 26, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To File Supplement to Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/26/13. (nmmsl, )
October 17, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/17/13. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
April 8, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/08/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rantz v. Hartley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geoffrey Del Rantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Hartley
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]