Martin v. Wegener

Defendant: Fred Wegener
Plaintiff: Abby Martin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00884
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/30/13. (sgrim)
June 7, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File her Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 13-6). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/7/13.(mnfsl, )
January 27, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/27/14. (sgrim)
February 19, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Stipulated Motion for In Camera Inspection of Personnel Files Concerning Plaintiff Abby Martin, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/19/14.(sgrim)
February 20, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. In those instances contained on the chart on pages 5-6 herein, the City of Golden is ORDERED to produce a document, such production will be made on or before February 25, 2014. Each produced document shall be marked Confidential and the pa rties to this case shall treat the documents as confidential pursuant to the Protective Order 41 entered in this case. Further, for each document produced to Defendant's counsel pursuant to the subpoena, copies shall also be mailed to the Plaintiffs counsel, F.J. Rick Dindinger, III, Dindinger Law Offices, LLC, 7951 East Maplewood Ave, Suite 285, Greenwood Village, CO 80111. The court will retain all the reviewed documents as conventionally filed under Restriction Level 3 and the same will be filed in the office of the Clerk of Court for the District of Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/20/14. (sgrim)
June 2, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/02/14. (jhawk, )
October 31, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Grant Oral Arguments on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Or Alternatively, for Leave to File a Surreply Brief. It is further Ordered that this case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/31/2014.(alowe)
November 5, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Final Judgment. ORDERED that plaintiff's claim against defendant Fred Wegener is dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have his costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court by Clerk on 11/5/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Wegener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wegener
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Martin
Represented By: Ralph Emerson Lamar, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]