Stromberg v. Crossroads Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Stromberg
Defendant: Crossroads Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00894
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/16/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/2/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/30/13. (rebsec, )
January 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal granting 23 Joint Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice. The combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 5/16/2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 6/2/2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/2014.(klyon, )
April 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stromberg v. Crossroads Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stromberg
Represented By: Reid Jason Elkus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Anthony Brutocao
Represented By: Matthew J. Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Brady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]