Cairns v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Lori Michelle Cairns
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv00901
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/2/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/2/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/17/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/10/13. (mnfsl, )
May 30, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Commissioners decision is AFFIRMED. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/30/2014. (evana, )
June 2, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. re 24 : Order Affirming Decision of Administrative Law Judge. The Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED, by Deborah Hansen, deputy clerk on 6/2/2014. (dhans, )
April 17, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Michelle Cairns
Represented By: Christopher Wallace Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]