Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-11

Defendant: Does 1-11
Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00902
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 17 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Defendant Doe 1's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Standing, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2013. (mehcd)
June 28, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe # 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/28/13. (jjhsl, )
August 6, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]