Trustees of the Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado et al v. Expert Mechanical Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Trustees of the Colorado Pipe Industry Annuity and Salary Deferral Trust Fund, Trustees of the Denver Plumbers Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Mechanical Contractors Association of Northern Colorado, The, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund and Journeymen Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 3, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing & Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Defendant: Expert Mechanical Services, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00911
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Civil Trial Procedures ORDER. The FPTC/TPC will be held on 2/10/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C204, Second Floor, Byron Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout St., Denver, Colorado. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2014. Bench Trial set for 4/3/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/19/2013. (klyon, )
June 20, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Expert Mechanical Services, Inc. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/20/2014.(klyon, )
July 9, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Default Judgment Against Expert Mechanical Services, Inc. Default judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf plaintiffs, the Trustees of the Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado; Trustees of the Color ado Pipe Industry Annuity and Salary Deferral Trust Fund; Trustees of the Denver Plumbers Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund; Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund. Journeymen Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 3; and the Mechanical Contractors Association of Northern Colorado, against defendant, Expert Mechanical Services, Inc., on plaintiffs' claim for relief against Expert under ERISA section 515. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/2014.(klyon, )
September 30, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/30/2014.(trlee, )
April 10, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/16/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trustees of the Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado et al v. Expert Mechanical Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Colorado Pipe Industry Annuity and Salary Deferral Trust Fund
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Denver Plumbers Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanical Contractors Association of Northern Colorado, The
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Journeymen Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 3, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing & Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Represented By: Martin D. Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expert Mechanical Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Edgar L. Neel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]