National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Guaranty Bank & Trust Company, et al

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Guaranty Bank and Trust Company, John D. Wagner, Jeffrey M. Wagner and Kristie Wagner
Case Number: 1:2013cv00926
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 25 Motion to Amend, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/2013.(trlee, )
December 6, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 1/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204, before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/6/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )
January 2, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to appear by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference on January 6, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. by dialing the Court at 303-335-2770. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/2/2014.(trlee, )
January 23, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Motion for Protective Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order [#49 at pages 4-13] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/14.(lag, )
January 23, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/14. (lag)
May 14, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Compel Defendant Jeffrey M. Wagner to Produce Documents and Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/14/2014.(klyon, )
March 2, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Strike Defendant Jeffrey M. Wagner's Answer and Affirmative Defenses and for Summary Judgment by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/2/15.(dkals, )
March 5, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, For an Order Limiting Plaintiff's Damages Claim filed by Defendant Guaranty Bank and Trust Company. Summary judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant on the Second Claim for Relief. Guaranty Bank is dismissed and awarded its costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/5/2015. (ebuch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Guaranty Bank & Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Brian E. Bates
Represented By: Thomas Michael Blewitt, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Judge
Represented By: Christopher James Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranty Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.