Wright v. Rosbro Corporation

Plaintiff: Oneil Wright
Defendant: Rosbro Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00929
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 13 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/19/2013. (rpmcd )
June 18, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney's fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit)
July 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/4/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 29, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/16/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Rosbro Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneil Wright
Represented By: Rebecca Joan Houlding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosbro Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]