Gates v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Gates
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00938
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/7/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 9/6/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/24/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/28/13. (mnfsl, )
May 13, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING ALJ'S DECISION DENYING DISABILTY BENEFITS. Each party shall pay its own costs and attorneys fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/13/2014. (athom, )
May 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/14/2014. (shart)
April 17, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gates v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Gates
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]