Gonzales v. Sizemore

Defendant: City and County of Denver and Michael Sizemore
Plaintiff: Joaquin Gonzales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00946
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000no Job Discrimination (National Origin)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Jury Demand is granted. Plaintiff's proposed Amended Complaint (Doc. # 22-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall docket D oc. # 22-1 as the Amended Complaint. Defendants may stand on their pending Motion to Dismiss or may file a Motion to Dismiss directed to the Amended Complaint, on or before Friday, 9/6/2013. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/12/13.(mnfsl, )
February 19, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 31 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting in part 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Title VII claim against the City is dismissed. The City is dismissed from this case. This ca se shall be administratively closed. The case may be reopened by either party upon a showing of good cause. Parties shall file a status report within 30 days of any action that serves to lift the automatic stay, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/19/2014. (eseam)
April 22, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion to Reopen Case. ORDERED that this case shall be reopened by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/22/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales v. Sizemore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Franklin A. Nachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sizemore
Represented By: Franklin A. Nachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Gonzales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]