Hickey et al v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Sarah M. Hickey, Amy M. Gulden and Jay A. Ragsdale
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation and Brinker International, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00951
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 17 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 6/9/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/23/13. (rebsec, )
September 6, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER re: Corrected Stipulated Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations. the Corrected Stipulated Motion To Toll The Statute of Limitations [# 28 ] is GRANTED. The statute of limitations for the opt-in plaintiffs is equitably tolled from 9/18/2013, until and including the date on which the court resolves Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration of Individual Claims and To Dismiss Class Action Claims, Collective Action Claims, and Other Proceedings [# 22 ]. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/6/2013. (klyon, )
September 6, 2013 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay. The plaintiff shall file a status report within 14 days after any ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration 22 advising of the ruling and identifying anyscheduling and/or case management matters which should be addressed. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/6/13.(bnbcd, )
September 17, 2013 36 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Confidential Information. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/17/2013. (klyon, )
September 18, 2013 38 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Response Brief Out of Time. Plaintiffs' Corrected Response To Motion To Compel Arbitration[# 37 -1] is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/18/2013.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs' putative class and collective action claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The parties are ORDERED to proceed to arbitration of plaintiffs' individual claims. All pending pretria l deadlines, the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set Friday, May 16, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., and the trial set to commence Monday, June 9, 2014, are VACATED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/18/2014. (klyon, )
February 20, 2014 46 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Brinker International Payroll Company, L.P. against Amy M. Gulden, Jay A. Ragsdale, Sarah M. Hickey re: 45 Order by Clerk on 2/20/2014. (klyon, )
April 15, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Re: Motions for Class Certification. No later than 30 days after the first answer or other response, e.g., motion to dismiss, etc., to the complaint is filed by a defendant in this case, the plaintiff SHALL FILE a motion for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 (a) that addresses, inter alia, (i) the prerequisites at Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(1)-(4), and (ii) the matters at Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b); (b) that defines the proposed class; and (c) that requests the appointment of class counse l. The deadlines for filing response and reply briefs SHALL BE AS PRESCRIBED under D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1C. An applicant for class counsel SHALL ADDRESS the matters at Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(1)(A)(i)-(iv) and any other matter pertinent to the applicant� 39;s ability to fairly and adequately represent the interests of the proposed class. Based on the parties' submissions, the court WILL either rule on the papers, order further briefing, convene an evidentiary hearing, or take such further action as the court in its discretion deems proper and necessary. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/2013. (klyon, )
April 30, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Conference for 7/11/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/30/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hickey et al v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M. Hickey
Represented By: David H. Miller
Represented By: Leslie Ann Krueger-Pagett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy M. Gulden
Represented By: Leslie Ann Krueger-Pagett
Represented By: David H. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay A. Ragsdale
Represented By: Leslie Ann Krueger-Pagett
Represented By: David H. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]