Wellman v. Werholtz

Plaintiff: Jimmie Wellman
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Case Number: 1:2013cv00952
Filed: April 13, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall serve a summons, the amended complaint [# 8 ], and the Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction [# 9 ], including any attachments to those documents, on the defendant as soon as practicable. Defendant SHALL FILE a r esponse to the Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction [# 9 ] by 4/23/2013. The plaintiff SHALL FILE a reply by 4/24/2013. The court SHALL HEAR the Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction [# 9 ] on Thursday, 4/25/2013, commencing at 11:00 a.m.. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/22/2013. (klyon, )
April 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn held on 4/25/2013. Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction 9 is WITHDRAWN and that hearing on this Motion is VACATED. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (rebcd, )
June 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule the 6/11/13 Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set on 6/11/13, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 8/22/13, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. The parties shall file their proposed Scheduling Order no later than five business days before the conference. (mjgsl, )
August 5, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/2013.(klyon, )
September 13, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/13/13. (rebsec, )
December 9, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File aThird Amended Complaint. On or before 12/16/2013, defense counsel shall advisethe court whether the Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 32 and 41 ) shall be withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/9/2013.(klyon, )
December 17, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Withdrawing 32 Motion to Dismiss ; withdrawing 41 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2013.(mjwcd)
April 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/15/2013. (mjwcd)
October 6, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Vacate Trial set for October 20, 2014. The Trial Preparation Conference set 10/17/2014 at 10:00 AM and the trial set to commence 10/20/2014 at 8:30 AM, are VACATED and CONTINUED pending further order. Counsel SHALL CONTACT the court's administrative assistant on 10/14/2014 at 9:30 AM to reschedule the Trial Preparation Conference and trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/2014. (alowe)
October 14, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 4/17/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/14/14. (rebsec)
March 19, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of the defendants, Rick Raemisch and Maurice Fauvel, against the plaintiff, Jimmie Wellman. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/2015. (alowe)
March 19, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Maurice Fauvel (I), Rick Raemisch against Jimmie Wellman re: 95 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the clerk of the court in the time and manner dictated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Clerk on 3/19/2015. (alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellman v. Werholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Wellman
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]