Edwards et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Steve Edwards, Kathy Edwards and Michael Edwards
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00956
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )
June 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Re-Schedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/18/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/7/13.(mnfsl, )
December 17, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion for Protective Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order [#27-2] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/13.(lag, )
December 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/13. (lag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Edwards
Represented By: Annie Deprey Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Edwards
Represented By: Annie Deprey Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edwards
Represented By: Annie Deprey Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]