Thornton v. Daniels

Petitioner: Harold Thornton
Respondent: C. Daniels
Case Number: 1:2013cv00960
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/22/2013. (skl)
October 3, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the amended Application without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/13. (dkals, )
April 16, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/16/2013. (skl)
June 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]