Cabral v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Plaintiff: Brett Cabral
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00975
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 12 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/14/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 9/16/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/30/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/28/13. (mnfsl, )
October 16, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Remand. The Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with a remand of the cause to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/16/13.(mnfsl, )
October 16, 2013 19 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 18 Order. By Clerk on 10/16/13. (mnfsl, )
November 13, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $7,500.00. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/13/13.(mnfsl, )
April 17, 2013 6 Featured Case Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cabral v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Cabral
Represented By: Chris R. Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]