Malibu Media, LLC v. Ramierez

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.158.179
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00981
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/23/13.(jjhsl, )
April 21, 2014 45 Featured Case AMENDED COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Docket entry 43 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order is amended to reflect that the Court deemed 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses as confessed by the defendant and that the motion is granted. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
April 22, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDER that the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (ECF No. 32) is APPROVED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/22/2014. (evana, ) (Modified on 4/22/2014 This Entry is NOT a part of this case, it was docketed in error)(evana, ).
August 20, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE on the parties Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/20/2014. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Ramierez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.158.179
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]