Thomsen v. Capital One, N.A.

Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ross Thomsen
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00997
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/26/13. (msksec, )
September 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/18/2013. (klyon, )
May 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 6/18/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thomsen v. Capital One, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Jimmy Goh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Thomsen
Represented By: Stefan Kazmierski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]