Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.190.51.187

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.190.51.187
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01006
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Serve a Third PartySubpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/24/13.(jjhsl, )
October 21, 2013 28 Featured Case TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER: Three-day Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/15/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2013. (mehcd)
March 4, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice 33 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and all remaining deadlines and conference dates are hereby vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2014. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.190.51.187
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.190.51.187
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]