Allred v. Triangle Petroleum Corporation

Defendant: Triangle Petroleum Corporation
Plaintiff: Erica L. Allred
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01011
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112 American with Disabilities Act (ADA- Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/24/2013. (klyon, )
November 6, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case 31 , this matter shall be dismissed without prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/6/2013. (eseam)
April 19, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/13/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/19/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )
June 18, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. It is ORDERED that the judge's file be returned to the clerk and that the case be reassigned by random draw. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/18/13. (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allred v. Triangle Petroleum Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica L. Allred
Represented By: Meghan W. Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]